Trustees 1ST HOLMES CHAPEL SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 506093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine Frances Lindley Horne | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Laura Hughes | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Margaret Bishop | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Lesley Gregory | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Robert Bishop | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan MacDonald | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Rebecca Mallon | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.