IMPACT BARNET

Charity number: 1161670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £19.94k £21.43k £17.18k £16.83k £74.63k
Total expenditure £12.28k £19.09k £22.12k £18.38k £31.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A