THE BRITISH BIKER RELIEF FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1161587
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £13.52k £11.02k £12.58k £37.58k £14.83k
Total expenditure £878 £8.65k £4.98k £9.26k £36.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A