Financial history BERAKAH ARTS LIMITED

Charity number: 1166856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £16.54k £6.96k £14.61k £3.11k £712
Total expenditure £9.13k £9.61k £7.56k £14.46k £1.23k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A