ARK COMMUNITY CHURCH SUTTON COLDFIELD

Charity number: 1161799
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £67.44k £126.34k £125.89k £129.13k £258.93k
Total expenditure £106.37k £128.18k £117.74k £116.13k £106.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A