KENTISH TOWN YOUTH FOOTBALL TRUST

Charity number: 1161485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £19.91k £27.05k £69.61k £41.09k £44.44k
Total expenditure £18.81k £18.86k £57.34k £47.59k £43.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A