ROSE HILL JUNIOR YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 1161836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £42.60k £44.69k £71.13k £143.61k £115.95k
Total expenditure £34.98k £43.91k £58.68k £120.55k £113.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.50k £0 £7.70k £12.95k £3.00k