Financial history FAUST CHAMBER ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1163070
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £55.00k £41.63k £16.93k £22.54k £31.40k
Total expenditure £29.51k £62.98k £11.09k £28.91k £28.87k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A