Financial history ABBOTS BROMLEY SPORTS ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1165021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £116.00k £33.97k £36.69k £170.57k £127.10k
Total expenditure £198.00k £42.18k £33.58k £174.80k £133.97k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.00k £10.00k £20.00k £500 £1.50k