Financial history TRANSFORM THEATRE PROJECTS

Charity number: 1162870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £108.36k £343.47k £184.52k £94.62k £416.42k
Total expenditure £78.76k £350.87k £113.91k £61.18k £367.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £27.00k £156.71k £118.61k £59.00k £79.10k