THE NATIONAL FOREST COMPANY

Charity number: 1166563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.11m £3.48m £3.59m £3.74m £5.61m
Total expenditure £2.89m £2.80m £3.52m £3.08m £3.48m
Income from government contracts £27.00k £21.72k £29.00k £28.00k £70.27k
Income from government grants £2.53m £2.90m £2.63m £2.63m £4.61m
Income - Donations and legacies £2.57m £2.94m £109.68k £403.46k £480.70k
Income - Other trading activities £37.06k £79.05k £63.54k £121.84k £80.43k
Income - Charitable activities £489.81k £456.65k £877.47k £672.51k £413.02k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £14.07k £5.73k £9.08k £15.76k £26.81k
Income - Other £0 £0 £2.53m £2.53m £4.61m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.49m £2.29m £2.91m £2.45m £2.71m
Expenditure - Raising funds £391.00k £506.46k £608.26k £634.62k £772.69k
Expenditure - Governance £41.26k £73.97k £64.17k £114.46k £79.99k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.10m £617.57k £371.98k £289.51k £221.21k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £16.70k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0