Trustees BREAKING BARRIERS
Charity number: 1161901

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonas Huruy Kidane | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Downie | Trustee | 17 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Serra | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Maklowicz | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lena Sabbagh | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Rickard | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Waidhofer | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Prudence Mazili Mwanza | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hani Kablawi | Trustee | 28 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Christopher Newell | Trustee | 07 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Harrington | Trustee | 14 August 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.