Trustees ORWELL PANTHERS ATHLETICS CLUB
Charity number: 1163145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MITZI CECILIA READ | Chair | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Brown | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Robinson | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Crawford | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hunt | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAUL RICHARD DAVIS | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANITA CAROLYN ABBOTT | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian Ling | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET NICHOLLS | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANN BROWN | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER LAU | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Hunt | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
COLIN ARTHUR HINDLE | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.