ABSOLUTE BULL TERRIER TRUST

Charity number: 1165661
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 February 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 February 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 May 2019 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required