SUNDERLAND WEST COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 506320
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 30 December 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 19 January 2020 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 19 January 2020 387 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 18 January 2020 751 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2016 18 January 2020 1116 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 Not Required