Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KINGSDOWN AND CREEKSIDE IN THE DIOCESE OF CANTERBURY
Charity number: 1162554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV CANON DR STEPHEN HUNTER LILLICRAP | Chair | 26 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
David Andrew Willis | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Alexander Jardine | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Warren | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Rose Eileen Steel | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Trim | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Relf | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
heather parry | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
mary Lucy Gollop | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT EDWARD PRICHARD | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
JEAN ROSE HEWETT | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN BUCKETT | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|||||
LES ROBERTS | Trustee | 26 February 2014 |
|
|||||
HEATHER JEAN FLOOD | Trustee | 26 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
BRUCE ROY LECKIE | Trustee | 26 February 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.