Accounts and annual returns HYDE COMMUNITY HUB
Charity number: 1162505
Charity reporting is overdue by 1516 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 August 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 55 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 55 days | |
Annual return | 01 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 421 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 421 days | |
Annual return | 01 August 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 786 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 786 days | |
Annual return | 01 August 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1151 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1151 days | |
Annual return | 01 August 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1516 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1516 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window