HYTHE TRIANGLE COMMUNITY GARDEN

Charity number: 1163141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £405 £0 £262 £50 £4.50k
Total expenditure £27.83k £0 £308 £0 £689
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £150 N/A £1.50k