HALE COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1166878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £30.26k £2.82k £0 £0 £2.40k
Total expenditure £7.73k £2.93k £1.08k £680 £983
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A