Governing document SHEFFIELD AREA KIDNEY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 506386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 JANUARY 1977 AS AMENDED 27 OCTOBER 1978 AMENDED 19 SEPTEMBER 1981, 22ND SEPTEMBER 1989, 27 SEPTEMBER 1991 AND 24 SEPTEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 17 MAY 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE RESEARCH INTO RENAL DISEASES AND FAILURE AND DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS THEREOF AND TO OFFER HELP AND ASSISTANCE TO RENAL PATIENTS AND THEIR RELATIVES. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2).
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.