Financial history PICCADILLY SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1162763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £68.97k £88.36k £75.86k £16.51k £6.63k
Total expenditure £68.12k £83.86k £76.78k £17.49k £6.79k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A