Financial history HEARTS IN HARMONY

Charity number: 1162457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £5.53k £38.57k £345 £0 £2.50k
Total expenditure £20.89k £2.27k £1.29k £1.19k £501
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A