Trustees PERSHORE AND DISTRICT VOLUNTEER CENTRE

Charity number: 1166141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Colin Davidson Chair 22 May 2017
None on record
Andrew Budden Trustee 13 December 2021
None on record
Dr Amanda Susannah Tanfield Trustee 28 June 2021
None on record
Ian Derek Middleton Trustee 18 January 2021
None on record
Valerie Elizabeth Smith Trustee 28 May 2019
PERSHORE UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
PERSHORE AND DISTRICT VOLUNTARY HELP CENTRE
Received: On time
MICHAEL ANTHONY ROWLEY Trustee 24 July 2017
PENSHAM COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
PERSHORE AND DISTRICT VOLUNTARY HELP CENTRE
Received: On time
THE PERSHORE AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
THE PERSHORE RIVERSIDE CENTRE
Received: On time
John Rees Trustee 22 May 2017
PERSHORE AND DISTRICT VOLUNTARY HELP CENTRE
Received: On time