Trustees EVIDENCE AID
Charity number: 1163111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIKE CLARKE | Chair | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Xavier Bosch-Capblanch | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Roderick Floris Viergever PhD | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Robinson | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Euan Crawshaw | Trustee | 11 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
LADY DEBORAH MARY DIXON BSC | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr PHILIP THOMAS DAVIES PHD | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Stone | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.