Financial history PANAVIA TORNADO PRESERVATION GROUP

Charity number: 1163207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.30k £3.49k £2.35k £7.93k £2.71k
Total expenditure £272 £5.04k £1.49k £6.24k £2.48k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A