Financial history ST MERYL PTA

Charity number: 1162403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £22.78k £21.27k £21.27k £218 £4.85k
Total expenditure £17.99k £19.71k £19.71k £4.86k £4.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A