TRINITY CENTRE WHITBY

Charity number: 1164415
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carolyn Watkinson Trustee 13 December 2017 None on record
Hannah Thompson Trustee 04 April 2021 None on record
GILLIAN ALMACK Chair 16 November 2015 None on record
BRENDA EASTON Trustee 29 September 2015
FYLING HALL SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
Susan Clough Trustee 05 April 2021 None on record