Accounts and annual returns IMAGINE NATION

Charity number: 1166044
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is overdue by 14 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 July 2021 Overdue Overdue by 14 days
Accounts and TAR 02 July 2021 Overdue Overdue by 14 days
Annual return 02 July 2020 04 May 2022 367 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 July 2020 04 May 2022 367 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 02 July 2019 14 August 2020 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 July 2019 14 August 2020 104 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 02 July 2018 05 February 2020 279 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 July 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 February 2020 279 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 02 July 2017 16 January 2020 624 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 July 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 November 2018 197 days late Download Open in new window