Trustees WESTSIDE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION CIO
Charity number: 1166532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEBORAH MCDERMOTT | Chair | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID TAYLOR | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Stephen Baverstock | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Nicholas | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Neale | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA SKEATS | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY ALLEN | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jean Osbourne | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
JON MCDERMOTT | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
COLIN REGAN | Trustee | 11 June 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.