Trustees WEST KENT AREA QUAKER MEETING OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN

Charity number: 1166299
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Eleanor Brooks Trustee 09 January 2022
THE WHITE CLIFFS COUNTRY U3A
Received: On time
Janet Aldyth Rowe Trustee 09 January 2022
None on record
Merrill Woolf Trustee 13 October 2019
None on record
Elizabeth Whelan Trustee 08 October 2017
None on record
Duncan Dwinell Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
ESTELLA LOVETT Trustee 12 March 2016
None on record