UNION OF UEA STUDENTS LIMITED

Charity number: 1162866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £10.43m £12.28m £12.10m £11.39m £9.26m
Total expenditure £10.62m £11.81m £12.41m £11.85m £10.36m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.34m £1.74m £1.29m £1.30m £1.38m
Income - Other trading activities £8.47m £9.83m £10.06m £9.38m £6.50m
Income - Charitable activities £586.00k £641.00k £582.00k £672.00k £647.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.00k £2.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £37.00k £60.00k £169.00k £39.00k £733.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.47m £2.56m £2.53m £2.68m £1.67m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £9.25m £0 £9.18m £0
Expenditure - Governance £39.00k £18.00k £113.10k £15.00k £12.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £9.15m £0 £9.89m £0 £8.69m