Financial history MEETING POINT MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1162876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £41.71k £30.26k £20.93k £21.80k £17.19k
Total expenditure £44.75k £38.40k £22.57k £31.26k £8.71k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A