JAKE SHAW CLIMBING TRUST

Charity number: 1163574
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £20.68k £14.77k £307 £245 £0
Total expenditure £28 £31 £34.00k £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A