Financial history ARISE AND SHINE TOGETHER

Charity number: 1165368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/03/2017 05/03/2018 05/03/2019 05/03/2020 05/03/2021
Total gross income £2 £0 £0 £1.00k £0
Total expenditure £0 £1.20k £1.00k £1.00k £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A