Accounts and annual returns GSM LONDON STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1165406
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | |||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | |||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | |||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 29 January 2020 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | 29 January 2020 | 183 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 13 December 2018 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window