THE THEOSOPHICAL SOCIETY IN ENGLAND

Charity number: 1167737
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Maurice Jenkinson Trustee 02 July 2020 None on record
SHAUN JOHNSON Trustee 11 May 2018
THE FOUNDATION FOR THEOSOPHICAL STUDIES Received: On time
LEICESTERSHIRE ACTION FOR MENTAL HEALTH PROJECT
NATIONAL SCHIZOPHRENIA FELLOWSHIP Received: On time
Susan Bayliss Trustee 11 May 2018
THE FOUNDATION FOR THEOSOPHICAL STUDIES Received: On time
Elizabeth Crofts Trustee 07 June 2018 None on record
JENNIFER MARY BAKER Trustee 28 July 2015 None on record
Noeline Hart Trustee 11 May 2018
THE FOUNDATION FOR THEOSOPHICAL STUDIES Received: On time
Eric McGough Trustee 07 December 2018 None on record