Trustees BOXMOOR AND WARNERS END NEIGHBOURHOOD ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1165570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARGARET ELIZABETH COXAGE | Chair | 15 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Anne Norton | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Lloyd | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Durrant | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Ann Elliot | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Dickson | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE POTTINGER | Trustee | 02 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
RONALD DAVID COXAGE | Trustee | 15 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Angela Antrobus | Trustee | 15 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Guest | Trustee | 15 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
GRAEME ELLIOT | Trustee | 15 February 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.