Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S CHURCH, BYFLEET
Charity number: 1163415
Charity reporting is overdue by 186 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVD JOHN HAMILTON MCCABE | Chair | 18 July 2006 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Oliver Calder | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Allan Edis | Trustee | 13 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Godfrey Way | Trustee | 13 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JIM ALLEN | Trustee | 17 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Denise Stiff | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Frossard | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDY HODSON | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JEAN-PIERRE FROSSARD | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ANN HODSON | Trustee | 21 April 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.