BAYTUL ILM TRUST

Charity number: 1164154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 August 2020 188 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 August 2020 188 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 May 2019 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 May 2019 99 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 August 2018 205 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 24 August 2018 205 days late Download