INSPIRE FUTURES FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1164394
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £410 £4.99k £2.45k £2.44k £5.39k
Total expenditure £392 £4.23k £2.77k £922 £2.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A