Financial history RCYC SAILING TRUST

Charity number: 1164964
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £14.04k £475 £220 £1.98k £120
Total expenditure £4.86k £2.38k £1.40k £1.78k £1.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A