Governing document MALVERN FESTIVAL CHORUS
Charity number: 506787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES SEPTEMBER 1966 AS AMENDED 5 JULY 1977 AND 10 MARCH 1987, 13 JULY 1999 AND 8 SEPTEMBER 2009. as amended on 08 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION A ND UNDERSTANDING OF MUSIC IN MALVERN AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT BY INSTRUCTION IN THE RELEVANT SKILLS AND THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER RELEVANT ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.