EDEN PLACE

Charity number: 1164882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 08 November 2017 On time Download