Financial history VOCES ACADEMY

Charity number: 1166868
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £18.99k £72.40k £31.02k £795 £0
Total expenditure £24.56k £41.21k £46.12k £7.12k £97
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A