FRIENDS OF HARTING CHURCH ENDOWMENT FUND

Charity number: 1163569
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £32.46k £21.01k £13.71k £4.72k £4.88k
Total expenditure £35 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A