Financial history WORSHIP CENTRAL

Charity number: 1164487
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £236.01k £201.80k £141.21k £30.93k £17.02k
Total expenditure £261.84k £182.33k £94.63k £109.65k £68.88k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £5.01k £4.29k