Financial history 22Q11.2 SOCIETY

Charity number: 1165896
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £3.41k £60.04k £932 £2.85k £181
Total expenditure £3.42k £58.77k £2.13k £1.23k £1.01k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A