Financial history The Russell Kin Trust

Charity number: 1164503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £0 £3.01k £4.87k £4.72k £4.22k
Total expenditure £7.44k £27.65k £6.95k £29.49k £17.88k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A