Financial history BRINDLE ST JOSEPH'S NURSERY GROUP

Charity number: 1163567
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £61.82k £72.13k £78.34k £67.53k £96.02k
Total expenditure £58.44k £77.98k £57.98k £79.24k £63.13k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £67.75k N/A N/A N/A