THE LAYBERRY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1166536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/10/2016 30/10/2017 30/10/2018 30/10/2019 30/10/2020
Total gross income £20.10k £0 £7.79k £80 £53.35k
Total expenditure £255 £1.00k £13.11k £960 £10.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A